No. 20A161 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Oklahoma, Applicant
v.
Shaun Michael Bosse
Docketed:April 26, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PCD-2019-124)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 26 2021Application (20A161) for a stay of mandate, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 27 2021Response to application (20A161) requested by Justice Gorsuch, due Friday, May 7, by 3 p.m. ET.
May 07 2021Response to application from respondent Shaun Michael Bosse filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 07 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Chickasaw Nation.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
May 12 2021Reply of applicant Oklahoma filed.
ReplyProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: State of Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
Zachary Charles Schauf
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ZSchauf@jenner.com
202-637-6379
Party name: Shaun Michael Bosse
Other
Frank Sharp Holleman IV
    Counsel of Record
Sonosky, Chambers, Sachse, Endreson & Perry, LLP
1425 K Street NW, Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

fholleman@sonosky.com
2026820240
Party name: Chickasaw Nation