No. 20A151
Title:Ritesh Tandon, et al., Applicants
v.
Gavin Newsom, Governor of California, et al.
Docketed:April 2, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-15228)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 02 2021Application (20A151) for injunctive relief, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 02 2021Response to application (20A151) requested by Justice Kagan, due Thursday, April 8 by 5 p.m. ET.
Apr 07 2021Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty submitted.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Apr 08 2021Response to application from respondents Gavin Newsom, Governor of California, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 09 2021Application (20A151) referred to the Court.
Apr 09 2021Application (20A151) granted by the Court. The application for injunctive relief presented to JUSTICE KAGAN and by her referred to the Court is granted pending disposition of the appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit and disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, if such writ is timely sought. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this order shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the order shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. (Detached Opinion). THE CHIEF JUSTICE would deny the application. JUSTICE KAGAN, with whom JUSTICE BREYER and JUSTICE SOTOMAYOR join, dissenting. (Detached Opinion).
Apr 09 2021Reply of Ritesh Tandon, et al. in support of application submitted.
ReplyProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Ryan Joseph Walsh
    Counsel of Record
Eimer Stahl LLP
10 East Doty Street
Suite 800
Madison, WI 53703

rwalsh@eimerstahl.com
608-441-5798
Party name: Ritesh Tandon, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Samuel Thomas Harbourt
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice, Office of the Solicitor General
455 Golden Gate Ave Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

Samuel.Harbourt@doj.ca.gov
415-510-3919
Party name: Gavin Newsom
Other
Eric Christopher Rassbach
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1919 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

erassbach@becketlaw.org
2029550095
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty