No. 20A150
Title:Texas, et al., Applicants
v.
Cook County, Illinois, et al.
Docketed:March 26, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3150)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 19 2021Application (20A150) for a stay pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 26 2021Response to application (20A150) requested by The Chief Justice, due Friday, April 9, 2021, by 5 p.m. ET.
Apr 09 2021Response to application from respondents Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 09 2021Response to application from respondents Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Secretary of Homeland Security, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Texas, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jessica Megan Scheller
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Cook County State's Attorney
500 Richard J. Daley Center Place, 5th Floor
Chicago, IL 60602

jessica.scheller@cookcountyil.gov
3126036934
Party name: Cook County, et al.
Tacy Fletcher Flint
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
One South Dearborn Street
Chicago, IL 60603

tflint@sidley.com
(312) 853-7875
Party name: Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc.
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States