No. 20-997
Title:Arlane James, et al., Petitioners
v.
Noah Bartelt
Docketed:January 26, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1432)
   Decision Date:April 21, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:August 6, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 04 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 25, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 17 2021Waiver of right of respondent Noah Bartelt to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 12 2021Response Requested. (Due April 12, 2021)
Mar 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 12, 2021 to May 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 12, 2021.
May 12 2021Brief of respondent Noah Bartelt in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 17 2021Record Requested.
Jun 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 23 2021Record received from the U.S.D.C. District of New Jersey (sealed documents received electronically). The remaining record is available on PACER.
Jun 28 2021Record received from the U.S.C.A. Third Circuit (1 envelope). The remaining record is available on PACER.
Jul 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Yvette Claudia Sterling
    Counsel of Record
Sterling Law firm
3000 Atrium Way
Suite 200
Mount Laurel, NJ 08054

Ycsterling2@aol.com
6092847518
Party name: Arlane James, et al.
Barbara E. RansomLaw Office of Barbara E. Ransom
3000 Atrium Way
Suite 200
Mt. Laurel, NJ 08054

barbara.ransom@me.com
2156202557
Party name: Arlane James, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeremy Michael Feigenbaum
    Counsel of Record
Office of the New Jersey Attorney General
25 Market Street
Trenton, NJ 08611

jeremy.feigenbaum@njoag.gov
609-376-2690
Party name: Noah Bartelt
Marvin L. FreemanState of New Jersey Office of the Attorney General
25 Market St., P.O. Box 112
Trenton, NJ 08625-0112

marvin.freeman@law.njoag.gov
1-609-376-2998
Party name: Noah Bartelt