No. 20-991
Title:Stevie L. England, Petitioner
v.
DeEdra Hart, Warden
Docketed:January 26, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-6039)
   Decision Date:August 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 14 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 25, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2021Waiver of right of respondent Scott Jordan, Warden to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 03 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kevin Barry Collins
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling
850 Tenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

kcollins@cov.com
202-662-5598
Party name: England
Attorneys for Respondent
Emily Bedelle Lucas
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1024 Capital Center Drive
Frankfort, KY 40601

emily.lucas@ky.gov
5026965342
Party name: Scott Jordan, Warden