No. 20-988
Title:Barry Smith, Superintendent, State Correctional Institution at Houtzdale, et al., Petitioners
v.
Aaron Edmunds Tyson
Docketed:January 25, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1391)
   Decision Date:September 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 18 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 24, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 21 2021Brief of Aaron Tyson in opposition not accepted for filing. (March 01, 2021)
Mar 01 2021Brief of Aaron Tyson in opposition submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Andrew Michael Kroeckel
    Counsel of Record
Monroe County District Attorney's Office
701 Main St., Suite 200
Stroudsburg, PA 18360

akroeckel@monroecountypa.gov
5705173877
Party name: Superintendent Houtzdale, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael Wiseman
    Counsel of Record
Wiseman & Schwartz, LLP
718 Arch Street
Suite 702 North
Philadelphia, PA 19106

wiseman_law@comcast.net
215-450-0903
Party name: Aaron Tyson