No. 20-984
Title:Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General of New Jersey, Petitioner
v.
Defense Distributed, et al.
Docketed:January 25, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-50723)
   Decision Date:August 19, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 19 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 24, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 24 2021Brief amici curiae of State of New York et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeremy Michael Feigenbaum
    Counsel of Record
Office of the New Jersey Attorney General
25 Market Street
Trenton, NJ 08611

jeremy.feigenbaum@njoag.gov
2017233388
Party name: Gurbir S. Grewal
Other
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: State of New York et al.