No. 20-982
Title:Sharon Lynn Brown, Petitioner
v.
Polk County, Wisconsin, et al.
Docketed:January 25, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2698)
   Decision Date:July 13, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:August 18, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 15 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 24, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 23 2021Brief amici curiae of National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 24 2021Brief of respondents Polk County, Wisconsin, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 24 2021Amicus brief of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, Restore the Fourth, Inc. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Vincent Joesph Moccio
    Counsel of Record
Bennerotte & Asscoiates. P.A.
3085 Justice Way, #200
Eagan, MN 55121

vincent@BENNEROTTE.COM
16127995160
Party name: Sharon Brown
Attorneys for Respondents
Danielle Baudhuin Tierney
    Counsel of Record
Axley Brynelson, LLP
Two East Mifflin Street
Suite 200
Madison, WI 53703

dtierney@axley.com
6085275661
Party name: Polk County, Wisconsin, et al.
Other
Katherine Susan Barrett Wiik
    Counsel of Record
Best & Flanagan
60 South Sixth Street, Suite 2700
Minneapolis, MN 55402

kbarrettwiik@bestlaw.com
612-341-9710
Party name: National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, et al.
Ruth Zemel Brown
    Counsel of Record
Loevy & Loevy
311 N. Aberdeen Street, 3rd Floor
Chicago, IL 60607

ruth@loevy.com
312-243-5900
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, Restore the Fourth, Inc.