No. 20-979
Title:Pankajkumar S. Patel, et al., Petitioners
v.
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
Docketed:January 22, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-10636)
   Decision Date:August 19, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 15 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 22, 2021)
PetitionAppendix
Jan 15 2021Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filng system.
Feb 11 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 22, 2021 to March 24, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Feb 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 24, 2021.
Mar 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 24, 2021 to April 23, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Mar 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 23, 2021.
Apr 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 23, 2021 to May 17, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Apr 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 17, 2021.
May 17 2021Brief of respondent Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General filed.
Main Document
May 28 2021Reply of petitioners Pankajkumar S. Patel, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 28 2021Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Jun 28 2021As Rule 34.6 provides, “If the Court schedules briefing and oral argument in a case that was governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c) or Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(c), the parties shall submit electronic versions of all prior and subsequent filings with this Court in the case, subject to [applicable] redaction rules.” Subsequent party and amicus filings in the case should now be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system, with any necessary redactions.
Jun 29 2021Taylor A.R. Meehan, Esquire, of Chicago, Illinois, is invited to brief and argue this case, as amicus curiae, in support of the judgment below.
Jul 13 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Pankajkumar S. Patel, et al.
Main Document
Jul 20 2021Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and the petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 31, 2021. The time to file the brief of the Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below is extended to and including October 19, 2021.
Aug 23 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Aug 31 2021Brief of petitioners Pankajkumar S. Patel, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of Service
Aug 31 2021Brief of respondent Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General in support filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Sep 03 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Immigration Lawyers Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Brief amici curiae of Former Executive Office for Immigration Review Judges filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2021Brief amici curiae of National Immigration Litigation Alliance filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 07 2021Brief amici curiae of The American Immigration Council, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, December 6, 2021.
Sep 27 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit.
Sep 28 2021The record from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer, also the record has been received and has been electronically filed.
Oct 19 2021Brief of Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2021Motion for divided argument filed by respondent Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General.
Proof of ServiceMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Ira Jay Kurzban
    Counsel of Record
Kurzban, Kurzban, et al.
131 Madeira Avenue
Coral Gables, FL 33134

ira@kktplaw.com
3054440060
Party name: Pankajkumar S. Patel, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Wilkinson, Acting Att'y Gen.
Taylor Ann Rausch Meehan
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

taylor@consovoymccarthy.com
703-243-9423
Party name: Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below
Other
Kathleen Roberta Hartnett
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
3 Embarcadero Center
20th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

khartnett@cooley.com
(415) 693-2000
Party name: The American Immigration Council, et al.
Holly Lee Henderson-Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
One Manhattan West
New York, NY 10001-8602

holly.henderson@skadden.com
212-735-3073
Party name: Law Professors
Mary Anne Kenney
    Counsel of Record
National Immigration Litigation Alliance
10 Griggs Terrace
Brookline, MA 02446

mary@immigrationlitigation.org
6178194681
Party name: National Immigration Litigation Alliance
Romy Louise Lerner
    Counsel of Record
UM Law Immigration Clinic
1311 Miller Drive, E-273
Coral Gables, FL 33146

rlerner@law.miami.edu
3052845448
Party name: American Immigration Lawyers Association
Richard W. Mark
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166

RMark@gibsondunn.com
(212) 351-4000
Party name: Former Executive Office for Immigration Review Judges