No. 20-975 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Freddie Owens, Petitioner
v.
Bryan P. Stirling, Director, South Carolina Department of Corrections, et al.
Docketed:January 22, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-8)
   Decision Date:July 22, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:August 18, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 15 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 22, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2021Brief of respondents Bryan P. Stirling, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 23 2021Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from March 10, 2021 to March 31, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 24 2021Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until March 31, 2021 granted.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Francis Williams
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland and Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

michael.williams@kirkland.com
(202) 389-5000
Party name: Freddie Owens
Attorneys for Respondents
Melody Jane Brown
    Counsel of Record
South Carolina Attorney General's Office
Post Office Box 11549
Columbia, SC 29211

mbrown@scag.gov
803-734-3970
Party name: Bryan P. Stirling, et al.