No. 20-97
Title:Massachusetts Lobstermen's Association, et al., Petitioners
v.
Wynn Coggins, Acting Secretary of Commerce, et al.
Docketed:July 30, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-5353)
   Decision Date:December 27, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:February 28, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 27 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 31, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Massachusetts Lobstermen's Association, et al.
Blanket Consent
Aug 21 2020Motion of Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc, et al. to extend the time to file a response from August 31, 2020 to September 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 30, 2020, for all respondents.
Aug 26 2020Motion of Ross, Sec. of Commerce, et al. to extend the time to file a response from August 31, 2020 to September 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 27 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 30, 2020, for all respondents.
Aug 31 2020Brief amici curiae of International Association of Geophysical Contractors, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2020Brief amici curiae of Utah Counties and Utah Representatives filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Forest Resource Council filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 30, 2020 to October 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 30, 2020, for all respondents.
Oct 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 30, 2020 to December 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 4, 2020, for all respondents.
Dec 04 2020Brief of respondents Ross, Wilbur, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 04 2020Brief of respondents Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2020Reply of petitioners Massachusetts Lobstermen's Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/15/2021.
Jan 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Jan 21 2021Letter of January 21, 2021 from counsel for petitioners filed.
Main DocumentOther
Feb 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021.
Mar 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jonathan Calvin Wood
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
3100 Clarendon Blvd., Suite 610
Arlington, VA 22201-5330

jwood@pacificlegal.org
(202) 888-6881
Party name: Massachusetts Lobstermen's Association, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ian Michael Fein
    Counsel of Record
Natural Resources Defense Council
111 Sutter Street, 21st Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104

ifein@nrdc.org
4158756147
Party name: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Wynn Coggins, Acting Secretary of Commerce, et al.
Other
Paul J. Beard II
    Counsel of Record
FisherBroyles LLP
4470 W. Sunset Blvd.
Suite 93165
Los Angeles, CA 90027

paul.beard@fisherbroyles.com
818-216-3988
Party name: International Association of Geophysical Contractors, National Ocean Industries Association, Offshore Operators Committee
Lawson Emmett Fite
    Counsel of Record
American Forest Resource Council
700 N.E. Multnomah, Ste. 320
Portland, OR 97232

lfite@amforest.org
5032229505
Party name: American Forest Resource Council
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
Barbara Anne Smith
    Counsel of Record
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
211 North Broadway, Suite 3600
St. Louis, MO 63102

barbara.smith@bclplaw.com
314-259-2367
Party name: Utah Counties and Utah Representatives