No. 20-969 | |
Title: | Freedom Watch, Inc., et al., Petitioners v. Google Inc., et al. |
Docketed: | January 15, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (19-7030) |
Decision Date: | May 27, 2020 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 5, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 02 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 16, 2021) |
PetitionAppendixProof of Service | |
Jan 19 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Twitter, Inc. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 19 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Apple Inc. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 19 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Facebook, Inc. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 19 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Google LLC (formerly Google Inc.) to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Feb 03 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021. |
Feb 19 2021 | Rescheduled. |
Feb 22 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021. |
Feb 25 2021 | Rescheduled. |
Mar 01 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021. |
Mar 04 2021 | Rescheduled. |
Mar 15 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021. |
Mar 18 2021 | Rescheduled. |
Mar 22 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021. |
Mar 25 2021 | Rescheduled. |
Mar 29 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021. |
Apr 05 2021 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Larry Elliot Klayman Counsel of Record | Klayman Law Group, P.A. 2020 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Suite 800 Washington, DC 20006 leklayman@gmail.com | 3105950800 |
Party name: Freedom Watch, Inc., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Kenneth Winn Allen Counsel of Record | Kirkland & Ellis, LLP 1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. Washington, DC 20004 winn.allen@kirkland.com | 202-389-5078 |
Party name: Facebook, Inc. | ||
Ian Heath Gershengorn Counsel of Record | Jenner & Block 1099 New York Ave., NW Suite 900 Washington, DC 20001 IGershengorn@jenner.com | 202-639-6869 |
Party name: Apple Inc. | ||
Jonathan M. Jacobson Counsel of Record | Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C. 1301 Avenue of the Americas, 40th Floor New York, NY 10019 jjacobson@wsgr.com | 212-497-7758 |
Party name: Twitter, Inc. | ||
John E. Schmidtlein | William & Connolly, LLP 725 Twelfth Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20005 jschmidtlein@wc.com | (202) 434-5901 |
Party name: Google LLC (formerly Google Inc.) |