No. 20-962
Title:United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, et al., Petitioners
v.
City and County of San Francisco, California, et al.
Docketed:January 21, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-17213, 19-17214, 19-35914)
   Decision Date:December 2, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 21 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 22, 2021)
PetitionProof of Service
Feb 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 22, 2021 to March 24, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 24, 2021, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Sara Jennifer Eisenberg
    Counsel of Record
San Francisco City Attorney's Office
City Hall, 1 Dr. Carlton B. Goodlett Place, Room 234
San Francisco, CA 94102

sara.eisenberg@sfcityatty.org
415-554-4633
Party name: City and County of San Francisco
Noah Guzzo Purcell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1125 Washington Street, SE
P.O. Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

noahp@atg.wa.gov
360-753-6200
Party name: State of Washington