No. 20-96
Vide 20-82
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Kane County, Utah, et al.
Docketed:July 30, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-4122)
   Decision Date:June 25, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:February 27, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 24 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 31, 2020)
PetitionAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of Service
Aug 14 2020Motion of respondents Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, et al. to extend the time to file a response from August 31, 2020 to October 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 27, 2020, for all respondents.
Oct 27 2020Brief of respondents Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 09 2020Reply of petitioner United States filed. VIDED (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 10 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Dec 07 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020.
Jan 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/15/2021.
Jan 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Jan 25 2021Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondents
Stephen H. M. Bloch
    Counsel of Record
Southern Utah Wilderness All.
425 East 100 South
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

steve@suwa.org
8014863161
Party name: Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance et al.