No. 20-953
Title:Michael D. Ellis, Petitioner
v.
Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Docketed:January 14, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1074)
   Decision Date:May 13, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:August 11, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 08 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 16, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 16, 2021 to March 18, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 18, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan Ellis Taylor
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

jon@guptawessler.com
2028881741
Party name: Michael D. Ellis
Attorneys for Respondent
Byrne Joseph Decker
    Counsel of Record
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
Two Monument Square, Suite 703
Portland, ME 04101

b.decker@ogletree.com
207-387-2963
Party name: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston