No. 20-951
Title:Mary Stewart, as Administrator of the Estate of Luke O. Stewart, Sr., Deceased, Petitioner
v.
City of Euclid, Ohio, et al.
Docketed:January 15, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3767)
   Decision Date:August 14, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 11 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 16, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 21 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Institute for Justice.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 16, 2021 to March 18, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 18, 2021.
Feb 08 2021Motion of Professor Seth Stoughton and Policing Scholars for leave to file amicus brief not accepted for filing. (February 09, 2021)
Feb 09 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Professor Seth Stoughton and Policing Scholars.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 16 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Legal Scholars.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Devi Maheswari Rao
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
501 H St. NE, Suite 275
Washington, DC 20002

devi.rao@macarthurjustice.org
202-637-6390
Party name: Mary Stewart, as Administrator of the Estate of Luke O. Stewart, Sr., Deceased
Attorneys for Respondents
Frank H. Scialdone
    Counsel of Record
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder Co.
100 Franklin's Row
34305 Solon Road
Cleveland, OH 44139

fscialdone@mrrlaw.com
440-248-7906
Party name: City of Euclid
Other
Edward John Bennett
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

ebennett@wc.com
202-434-5083
Party name: Professor Seth Stoughton and Policing Scholars
Wesley Patrick Hottot
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
600 University Street
Suite 1730
Seattle, WA 98101

whottot@ij.org
206-957-1300
Party name: Institute for Justice
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: Legal Scholars