No. 20-941
Title:Gregory Atkins, et al., Petitioners
v.
Kenneth Williams, Medical Director, Tennessee Department of Correction
Docketed:January 13, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-6243)
   Decision Date:August 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 08 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 12, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 12, 2021 to March 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 26 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 12, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael Joseph Wall
    Counsel of Record
Branstetter, Stranch & Jennings, PLLC
223 Rosa L. Parks Avenue, Suite 200
Nashville, TN 37203

michaelw@bsjfirm.com
615-254-8801
Party name: Gregory Atkins, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Sarah Keeton Campbell
    Counsel of Record
Tennessee Office of the Attorney General
500 Dr. Martin L. King, Jr., Blvd.
Nashville, TN 37243

Sarah.Campbell@ag.tn.gov
(615) 532-6026
Party name: Kenneth Williams