No. 20-940
Title:Alaska, Petitioner
v.
Sean Wright
Docketed:January 13, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-35543)
   Decision Date:September 2, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 9, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 07 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 12, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 12, 2021 to March 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 15, 2021.
Feb 12 2021Brief amici curiae of States of Indiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Timothy Winn Terrell
    Counsel of Record
State of Alaska, Dept of Law
1031 W. 4th Avenue
Suite 200
Anchorage, AK 99501

tim.terrell@alaska.gov
907-269-6260
Party name: Alaska
Attorneys for Respondent
Stuart Banner
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law Supreme Court Clinic
405 Hilgard Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90095

banner@law.ucla.edu
3102068506
Party name: Sean Wright
Other
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: States of Indiana, Louisiana, Alabama, Arizona, Connecticut, Idaho, Kansas, Kentucky, Michigan, Mississippi, Montana, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, Pennsylvania, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, and Utah