No. 20-937
Title:Robert Andrews, Petitioner
v.
New Jersey
Docketed:January 13, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of New Jersey
   Case Numbers:(082209)
   Decision Date:August 10, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 07 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 12, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2021Brief amici curiae of Office of the Public Defender of the State of New Jersey, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2021Brief amici curiae of Cordell Institute at Washington University, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2021Waiver of right of respondent State of New Jersey to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 12 2021Brief amicus curiae of Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers of New Jersey filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 12 2021Brief amicus curiae of Laurent Sacharoff filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 17 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.
Feb 17 2021Response Requested. (Due March 19, 2021)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jennifer Stisa Granick
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School
559 Nathan Abbot Way
Stanford, CA 94305

jgranick@aclu.org
415-343-0758
Party name: Robert Andrews
Attorneys for Respondent
Frank J. Ducoat
    Counsel of Record
Essex County Prosecutor's Office
50 W. Market Street
Newark, NJ 07102

frank.ducoat@njecpo.org
973-621-4682
Party name: State of New Jersey
Other
Neil Michael Richards
    Counsel of Record
Cordell Institute of Washington University in St. Louis
One Brookings Drive
St. Louis, MO 63130

nrichards@wustl.edu
13149354794
Party name: Cordell Institute at Washington University
Ryan Geoffrey Baker
    Counsel of Record
Waymaker LLP
777 S. Figueroa St., 2850
Los Angeles, CA 90017

rbaker@waymakerlaw.com
4246527800
Party name: Laurent Sacharoff
Candida JoLynn Griffin
    Counsel of Record
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden, P.C.
21 Main Street, Suite 200
Hackensack, NJ 07601

cgriffin@pashmanstein.com
2014888200
Party name: Office of the Public Defender and National Association for Public Defense
Marissa Koblitz Kingman
    Counsel of Record
Fox Rothschild, LLP
49 Market Street
Morristown, NJ 07960

mkingman@foxrothschild.com
973-548-3316
Party name: Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers of New Jersey