No. 20-928
Title:National Coalition For Men, et al., Petitioners
v.
Selective Service System, et al.
Docketed:January 12, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-20272)
   Decision Date:August 13, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 08 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 11, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 11, 2021 to March 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 15, 2021.
Feb 10 2021Brief amici curiae of General Michael Hayden, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2021Brief amici curiae of Modern Military Association of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2021Brief amici curiae of National Organization for Women Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 15, 2021 to April 14, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 14, 2021.
Mar 12 2021Brief amici curiae of Center for Military Readiness, et al filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Ria Tabacco Mar
    Counsel of Record
ACLU
ACLU
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004-2400

rmar@aclu.org
(212) 549-2500
Party name: National Coalition For Men, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Selective Service System, et al.
Other
William Allen Woodruff
    Counsel of Record
The Woodruff Law Firm
Post Office Box 236
Midway, UT 84049

wawlaw@icloud.com
9106588624
Party name: Center for Military Readiness, et al
Thomas Mark Bondy
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

tbondy@orrick.com
202-339-8406
Party name: National Organization for Women Foundation, Women’s Law Project, Gender Justice, Women’s Law Center of Maryland, Inc., KWH Law Center for Social Justice and Change
Lindsay C. Harrison
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

LHarrison@jenner.com
(202)-639-6000
Party name: General Michael Hayden, et al.
Jaime Ann Santos
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
1900 N St. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jsantos@goodwinlaw.com
2023464000
Party name: Modern Military Association of America, et al.