No. 20-923 | |
Title: | Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, Petitioner v. Rodrigo Acosta-Pena |
Docketed: | January 11, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (19-9557) |
Decision Date: | July 22, 2020 Rule 12.4 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 11, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 08 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 10, 2021) |
Jan 08 2021 | Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system. |
Mar 03 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021. |
Mar 03 2021 | Response Requested. (Due April 2, 2021) |
Mar 25 2021 | Brief of respondent Rodrigo Acosta-Pena in opposition filed. |
Apr 14 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/30/2021. |
May 03 2021 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Brian H. Fletcher | Acting Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Christine Marie Hernandez Counsel of Record | Hernandez & Associates, PC 1801 York Street Denver, CO 80206 chernandez@hdezlaw.com | 3036231122 |
Party name: Moises Magana-Arias | ||
Shawn David Meade Counsel of Record | MyRights Immigration Law Firm 8205 E. Colfax Ave. Denver, CO 80220 smeade@myrightsimmigration.com | 303-495-5121 |
Party name: Rodrigo Acosta-Pena |