No. 20-921
Title:Braulio Marcelo Castillo, Petitioner
v.
Virginia
Docketed:January 8, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Virginia
   Case Numbers:(191028)
   Decision Date:February 27, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:August 5, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 04 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 8, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joseph Douglas King
    Counsel of Record
King, Campbell, Poretz PLLC
108 N. Alfred Street
2nd Floor
Alexandria, VA 22314

jking@kingcampbell.com
703-683-7070
Party name: Braulio M. Castillo