No. 20-915
Title:Unicolors, Inc., Petitioner
v.
H&M Hennes & Mauritz, L.P.
Docketed:January 8, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-56253, 18-56548)
   Decision Date:May 29, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:August 7, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 04 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 8, 2021)
PetitionPetitionAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2021Waiver of right of respondent H&M Hennes & Mauritz, L.P., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 09 2021Response Requested. (Due March 11, 2021)
Mar 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 11, 2021 to April 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 1, 2021.
Mar 11 2021Brief amici curiae of American Society of Media Photographers and California Society of Entertainment Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2021Brief of respondents H&M Hennes & Mauritz, L.P., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 12 2021Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from April 21, 2021 to May 4, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 13 2021Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until May 4, 2021 granted.
May 03 2021Reply of petitioner Unicolors, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/20/2021.
May 24 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021.
Jun 01 2021Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Jun 25 2021Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 3, 2021. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 21, 2021.
Jul 13 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Unicolors, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Jul 19 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, H&M Hennes & Mauritz, L.P., et al.
Blanket Consent
Aug 03 2021Brief of petitioner Unicolors, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 03 2021Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Copyright Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 10 2021Brief amici curiae of American Society of Media Photographers and California Society of Entertainment Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 10 2021Brief amici curiae of Intellectual Property Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of the United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 16 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Monday, November 8, 2021.
Sep 01 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Sep 21 2021CIRCULATED
Sep 21 2021Brief of respondents H&M Hennes & Mauritz, L.P., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of New York Intellectual Property Law Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 28 2021Brief amici curiae of Professors of Copyright Law filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 28 2021Brief amici curiae of Center for Democracy & Technology and Electronic Frontier Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 28 2021Brief amici curiae of Andrew D. Lockton and McHale & Slavin, P.A. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 28 2021Brief amici curiae of California Fashion Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of Victoria Burke filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 28 2021Amicus brief of National Retail Federation not accepted for filing. (Corrected version submitted) (October 04, 2021)
Sep 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Retail Federation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 12 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED.
Oct 14 2021The record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Oct 14 2021Reply of petitioner Unicolors, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2021The time for oral argument is allotted as follows: 20 minutes for petitioner, 15 minutes for the Acting Solicitor General, and 35 minutes for respondent.
Nov 08 2021Argued. For petitioner: E. Joshua Rosenkranz, New York, N. Y.; and Melissa N. Patterson, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: Peter K. Stris, Los Angeles, Cal.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: Unicolors, Inc.
Scott Alan BurroughsDoniger / Burroughs APC
603 Rose Avenue
Venice, CA 90291

scott@donigerlawfirm.com
3105901820
Party name: Unicolors, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Staci Jennifer Riordan
    Counsel of Record
Nixon Peabody LLP
300 South Grand Avenue, Suite 4100
Los Angeles, CA 90071

sriordan@nixonpeabody.com
2136296000
Party name: H&M Hennes & Mauritz LP
Peter K. Stris
    Counsel of Record
Stris and Maher LLP
777 S. Figueroa Street
Suite 3850
Los Angeles, CA 90017

pstris@stris.com
2139956800
Party name: H&M Hennes & Mauritz, L.P., et al.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Samuel Gary Brooks
    Counsel of Record
Call & Jensen, a Professional Corporation
610 Newport Center Drive, Suite 700
Newport Beach, CA 92660

sbrooks@calljensen.com
949.717.3000
Party name: National Retail Federation
Margaret M. Duncan
    Counsel of Record
Loyola University Chicago School of Law
25 E Pearson Street
Chicago, IL 60611

mduncan@luc.edu
312 915 7120
Party name: The Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago
Roy T. Englert Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck & Untereiner LLP
2000 K Street, N.W
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

renglert@robbinsrussell.com
2027754503
Party name: Professors of Copyright Law
Kelly M. Klaus
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
560 Mission St
27th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105

Kelly.Klaus@mto.com
415-512-4000
Party name: Copyright Alliance
Jeffrey LewisJeff Lewis Law
609 Deep Valley Drive
Suite 200
Rolling Hills Estates, CA 90274

Jeff@JeffLewisLaw.com
3109354001
Party name: California Fashion Association
Thomas Blake Maddrey
    Counsel of Record
American Society of Media Photographers, Inc.
Four Embarcadero Center
Suite 1400
San Francisco, CA 94111

maddrey@asmp.org
2147011875
Party name: American Society of Media Photographers and California Society of Entertainment Lawyers
Edward Fortune McHale
    Counsel of Record
McHale & Slavin, P.A.
2855 PGA Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33401

emchale@mchaleslavin.com
561-625-6575
Party name: Andrew D. Lockton and McHale & Slavin, P.A.
Nancy J. Mertzel
    Counsel of Record
Mertzel Law PLLC
5 Penn Plaza, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10001

nancy@mertzel-law.com
646-965-6900
Party name: American Intellectual Property Law Association
Tyler Trent Ochoa
    Counsel of Record
Santa Clara University School of Law
500 El Camino Real
Santa Clara, CA 95053

ttochoa@scu.edu
408-554-2765
Party name: Intellectual Property Law Professors
John Paul O'Herron
    Counsel of Record
ThompsonMcMullan, P.C.
100 Shockoe Slip, Third Floor
Richmond, VA 23219

joherron@t-mlaw.com
8046986253
Party name: Victoria Burke
Morgan Elliott Pietz
    Counsel of Record
Pietz & Shahriari, LLP
9454 Wilshire Blvd., Ste. 310
Beverly Hills, CA 90212

morgan@pstrials.com
3104245557
Party name: California Fashion Association
Robert Lloyd Raskopf
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Ave., 22nd Fl.
New York, NY 10010

robertraskopf@quinnemanuel.com
2128497185
Party name: New York Intellectual Property Law Association
Jonathan Lentine Williams
    Counsel of Record
Jonathan L. Williams, P.A.
113 South Monroe Street, First Floor
Tallahassee, FL 32301

jw@jonathanwilliamslaw.com
850-706-0940
Party name: Center for Democracy & Technology and Electronic Frontier Foundation