No. 20-911
Title:Michael Jackson, Petitioner
v.
Don Hudson, Warden
Docketed:January 8, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3053)
   Decision Date:August 4, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 31 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 8, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 8, 2021 to March 10, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 10, 2021.
Mar 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 10, 2021 to April 9, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 9, 2021.
Mar 26 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 9, 2021 to May 10, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 10, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kevin K. Russell
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein and Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

krussell@goldsteinrussell.com
2023620636
Party name: Michael Jackson
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Hudson, Don