No. 20-905
Title:Independent School District No. 283, Petitioner
v.
E. M. D. H. ex rel. L. H. and S. D.
Docketed:January 5, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1269, 19-1336)
   Decision Date:June 3, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:August 5, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 31 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 4, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 06 2021Waiver of right of respondent E.M.D.H. ex rel. L.H. and S.D. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 13 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Jan 13 2021Brief amici curiae of National School Boards Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 25 2021Response Requested. (Due February 24, 2021)
Feb 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 24, 2021 to March 26, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 26, 2021
Feb 03 2021Brief amicus curiae of Minnesota Association of School Administrators filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 11 2021Brief amici curiae of School Superintendents Association (ASSA, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Independent School District No. 283
Attorneys for Respondent
Roman Martinez V
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

roman.martinez@lw.com
202-637-3377
Party name: E.M.D.H. ex rel. L.H. and S.D.
Amy Jane GoetzSchool Law Center, LLC
452 Selby Avenue.
Suite 2E
Saint Paul, MN 55101

agoetz@schoollawcenter.com
6512226288
Party name: E.M.D.H. ex rel. L.H. and S.D.
Other
Thomas Mark Bondy
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

tbondy@orrick.com
202-339-8406
Party name: School Superintendents Association (ASSA, Association of Educational Service Agencies (AESA), Arkansas Association of Educational Administrators (AAEA), Minnesota Administrators for Special Education (MASE)
Hyland Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave. NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

hhunt@deutschhunt.com
2028686915
Party name: Minnesota Association of School Administrators
Lucas Michael Walker
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
600 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20037

lwalker@mololamken.com
2025562014
Party name: National School Boards Association, et al.