No. 20-895
Title:Scott Seldin, Individually and as Trustee of the Selden 2002 Irrevocable Trust, dated October 9, 1993, et al., Petitioners
v.
Estate of Stanley C. Silverman, et al.
Docketed:January 7, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Nebraska
   Case Numbers:(S-19-310, S-19-311)
   Decision Date:March 6, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:August 4, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 31 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 8, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Jan 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 8, 2021 to April 9, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 9, 2021.
Apr 08 2021Brief of Estate of Stanley C. Silverman, et al. in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Roman Martinez V
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

roman.martinez@lw.com
202-637-3377
Party name: Scott Seldin, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Barbara Anne Smith
    Counsel of Record
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
211 North Broadway, Suite 3600
St. Louis, MO 63102

barbara.smith@bclplaw.com
314-259-2367
Party name: Estate of Stanley C. Silverman, et al.