No. 20-892 | |
Title: | Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc., et al., Petitioners v. Illumina, Inc., et al. |
Docketed: | January 5, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2019-1419) |
Decision Date: | August 3, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 30 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 4, 2021) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 03 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Illumina, Inc., et al. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Feb 10 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021. |
Feb 16 2021 | Response Requested. (Due March 18, 2021) |
Feb 19 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 18, 2021 to April 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Feb 22 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 19, 2021. |
Apr 19 2021 | Brief of respondents Illumina, Inc., et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 04 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/20/2021. |
May 04 2021 | Reply of petitioners Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 21 2021 | Joint stipulation of dismissal under Rule 46.1 filed. |
Main Document | |
May 21 2021 | Petition Dismissed - Rule 46. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Daralyn Jeannine Durie Counsel of Record | Durie Tangri LLP 217 Leidesdorff St San Francisco, CA 94111 ddurie@durietangri.com | 4153626666 |
Party name: Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Edward R. Reines Counsel of Record | Weil, Gotshal & Manges, LLP 201 Redwood Shores Parkway Redwood Shores, CA 94065 edward.reines@weil.com | 650-802-3022 |
Party name: Illumina, Inc., et al. |