No. 20-886
Title:Thelma G. McCoy, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 4, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-40269)
   Decision Date:June 5, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:August 3, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 30 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 3, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 11 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 3, 2021 to March 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 5, 2021.
Jan 29 2021Brief amici curiae of National Consumer Bankruptcy Rights Center and National Association of Consumer Bankruptcy Attorneys filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 02 2021Brief amici curiae of Consumer Bankruptcy and Student Loan Academics filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 03 2021Brief amicus curiae of Center for Responsible Lending filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 5, 2021 to April 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 5, 2021.
Mar 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 5, 2021 to May 7, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 7, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Adam Rubens
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 W 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

drubens@orrick.com
2125063679
Party name: Thelma G. McCoy
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
William Rhodes Corbett
    Counsel of Record
Center for Responsible Lending
302 W. Main Street
Durham, NC 27701

will.corbett@responsiblelending.org
919-672-7831
Party name: Center for Responsible Lending
Tara Twomey
    Counsel of Record
National Consumer Bankruptcy Rights Center
1501 The Alameda
San Jose, CA 93921

tara.twomey@comcast.net
8312290256
Party name: National Consumer Bankruptcy Rights Center and National Association of Consumer Bankruptcy Attorneys
Carter Capps White
    Counsel of Record
UC Davis Civil Rights Clinic
One Shields Avenue, Bldg. TB-30
Davis, CA 95616

ccwhite@ucdavis.edu
5307525440
Party name: Consumer Bankruptcy and Student Loan Academics