No. 20-883
Title:Donald J. Trump, Petitioner
v.
Wisconsin Elections Commission, et al.
Docketed:January 4, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3414)
   Decision Date:December 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 30 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 3, 2021)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 30 2020Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioner.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 11 2021Motion to expedite consideration filed by petitioner DENIED
Jan 15 2021Waiver of Wisconsin Elections Commission, et al. of right to respond submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William Bock III
    Counsel of Record
Kroger, Gardis & Regas, LLP
111 Monument Circle
Suite 900
Indianapolis, IN 46204-5125

wbock@kgrlaw.com
3176929000
Party name: Donald J. Trump
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas Charles Bellavia
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Department of Justice
17 W. Main Street
PO Box 7857
Madison, WI 53707-7857

bellaviatc@doj.state.wi.us
6082668690
Party name: Wisconsin Elections Commission, et al.