No. 20-880
Title:Michael H. Holland, as Trustee for the United Mine Workers of America Combined Benefit Fund and United Mine Workers of America 1992 Benefit Plan, et al., Petitioners
v.
Westmoreland Coal Company, et al.
Docketed:January 4, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-20066)
   Decision Date:August 4, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 29 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 3, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 17 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.
Feb 24 2021Response Requested. (Due March 26, 2021)
Feb 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 26, 2021 to April 16, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 26 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 16, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Bryan Michael Killian
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20004

Bryan.killian@morganlewis.com
2023736191
Party name: Trustees of the United Mine Workers of America Combined Benefit Fund, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
George William Hicks Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

george.hicks@kirkland.com
2028795000
Party name: Westmoreland Coal Company, et al.