No. 20-88 | |
Title: | HZNP Finance Limited, et al., Petitioners v. Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. |
Docketed: | July 29, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2017-2149, 2017-2152, 2017-2153, 2017-2202, 2017-2203, 2017-2206) |
Decision Date: | October 10, 2019 |
Rehearing Denied: | February 25, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jul 24 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 28, 2020) |
PetitionProof of Service | |
Aug 11 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Aug 19 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. |
Aug 31 2020 | Response Requested. (Due September 30, 2020) |
Sep 30 2020 | Brief of respondent Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Oct 14 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/30/2020. |
Oct 22 2020 | Reply of petitioners Hznp Finance Limited, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Nov 02 2020 | Petition DENIED. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Caryn Carson Borg-Breen Counsel of Record | Green, Griffith & Borg-Breen, LLP 676 North Michigan Avenue, Suite 3900 Chicago, IL 60611 cborg-breen@greengriffith.com | 312-883-8040 |
Party name: Hznp Finance Limited, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
John Christopher Rozendaal Counsel of Record | Sterne, Kessler, Goldstein & Fox P.L.L.C. 1100 New York Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20005 jcrozendaal@sternekessler.com | 2027728747 |
Party name: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. |