No. 20-875
Title:Sok Kong, Trustee for Next of Kin of Map Kong, Decedent, Petitioner
v.
City of Burnsville, Minnesota, et al.
Docketed:December 31, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1101)
   Decision Date:May 29, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:July 30, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 22 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 1, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 20 2021Waiver of City of Burnsville, et al. of right to respond not accepted for filing. (January 26, 2021)
Jan 20 2021Waiver of right of respondent City of Burnsville, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 20 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Bryan Lammon.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 03 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 16 2021Response Requested. (Due March 18, 2021)
Feb 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 18, 2021 to April 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 19, 2021.
Mar 18 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The National Police Accountability Project.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Michael Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
375 East Chicago Avenue
Chicago, IL 60611

david.shapiro@law.northwestern.edu
312-503-0711
Party name: Sok Kong, Trustee for Next-of-Kin of Map Kong, Decedent
Attorneys for Respondents
Joseph E. Flynn
    Counsel of Record
Jardine, Logan, et al.
8519 Eagle Point Blvd.
Suite 100
Lake Elmo, MN 55042

jflynn@jlolaw.com
6512906500
Party name: City of Burnsville, et al.
Other
Jonathan Loevy
    Counsel of Record
Loevy and Loevy
311 N. Aberdeen
3rd FL
Chicago, IL 60607

jon@loevy.com
312-243-5900
Party name: The National Police Accountability Project
Bryan David Lammon
    Counsel of Record
N/A
2801 W Bancroft St, Mail Stop 507
Toledo, OH 43606

bryan.lammon@utoledo.edu
4195304514
Party name: Bryan Lammon