No. 20-873 | |
Title: | Herman Miller, Inc., Petitioner v. Blumenthal Distributing, Inc., dba Office Star |
Docketed: | December 31, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-56471,18-56493) |
Decision Date: | June 25, 2020 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 4, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 23 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 1, 2021) |
PetitionProof of Service | |
Feb 01 2021 | Brief of respondent Blumenthal Distributing, Inc. d/b/a Office Star in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 11 2021 | Reply of petitioner Herman Miller, Inc. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Feb 17 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021. |
Mar 08 2021 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Jonathan E. Moskin Counsel of Record | Foley & Lardner LLP 90 Park Avenue New York, NY 10016 jmoskin@foley.com | 212-682-7474 |
Party name: Herman Miller, Inc. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
David A. Dillard Counsel of Record | Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP 655 N. Central Avenue Suite 2300 Glendale,, CA 91203 ddillard@lrrc.com | (626) 795-9900 |
Party name: Blumenthal Distributing, Inc. d/b/a Office Star |