No. 20-866
Title:Francesca Allen, et al., Petitioners
v.
Wells Fargo & Company, et al.
Docketed:December 30, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2781)
   Decision Date:July 27, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 23 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 29, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 29, 2021 to March 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 1, 2021.
Mar 01 2021Brief of respondents Wells Fargo & Company, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 15 2021Reply of petitioners Francesca Allen, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Matthew W.H. Wessler
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

matt@guptawessler.com
2028881741
Party name: Francesca Allen, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
    Counsel of Record
Proskauer Rose LLP
Eleven Times Square
New York, NY 10036

rhirschhorn@proskauer.com
2129693286
Party name: Wells Fargo & Company, et al.