No. 20-863 | |
Title: | Akeva L.L.C., Petitioner v. Nike, Inc., et al. |
Docketed: | December 30, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2019-2249) |
Decision Date: | July 16, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 14 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 29, 2021) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 13 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent adidas America, Inc. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 15 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Nike, Inc. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 20 2021 | Brief amicus curiae of US Inventor, Inc. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 03 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021. |
Feb 22 2021 | Petition DENIED. |
Mar 19 2021 | Petition for Rehearing filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 31 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021. |
Apr 19 2021 | Rehearing DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
John T. Battaglia Counsel of Record | 4608 Brookside Drive Alexandria, VA 22312 thebattaglialawfirm@gmail.com | (703) 658-2101 |
Party name: Akeva L.L.C. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Adam Howard Charnes Counsel of Record | Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP 2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 4400 Dallas, TX 75201 acharnes@kilpatricktownsend.com | 214-922-7106 |
Party name: adidas America, Inc. | ||
Stanley Joseph Panikowski III Counsel of Record | DLA Piper LLP (US) 401 B Street, Suite 1700 San Diego, CA 92101 stanley.panikowski@us.dlapiper.com | 619-699-2643 |
Party name: Nike, Inc. | ||
Other | ||
Robert P. Greenspoon Counsel of Record | Flachsbart & Greenspoon, LLC 333 N. Michigan Ave Suite 2700 Chicago, IL 60601 rpg@fg-law.com | 312-551-9500 |
Party name: US Inventor, Inc. |