No. 20-861
Title:Arlene Fry, Petitioner
v.
Rand Construction Corporation
Docketed:December 30, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2083)
   Decision Date:July 1, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:July 28, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 23 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 29, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2021Waiver of right of respondent Rand Construction Corporation to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 20 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Jan 25 2021Response Requested. (Due February 24, 2021)
Feb 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 24, 2021 to March 26, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 26, 2021.
Mar 26 2021Brief of respondent Rand Construction Corporation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 08 2021Reply of Arlene Fry submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam Augustine Carter
    Counsel of Record
Employment Law Group, PC
888 17th Street, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

acarter@employmentlawgroup.com
2024254269
Party name: Arlene Fry
Attorneys for Respondent
James Edward Tysse
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

jtysse@akingump.com
202-887-4571
Party name: Rand Construction Corporation