No. 20-860
Title:Ryan Randall Gilbertson, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 30, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3745)
   Decision Date:July 30, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 23 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 29, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 13 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 11 2021Response Requested. (Due March 15, 2021)
Mar 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 15, 2021 to April 14, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 14, 2021.
Apr 06 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 14, 2021 to May 14, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 14, 2021. (Docket entry corrected 4/8/21)
May 14 2021Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 01 2021Reply of petitioner Ryan Gilbertson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Ryan Gilbertson
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America