No. 20-86
Title:Charles Daniels, Director, Nevada Department of Corrections, et al., Petitioners
v.
Ronald Ross
Docketed:July 28, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-16533)
   Decision Date:February 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 23 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 27, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 27, 2020 to October 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 9, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Heidi Jill Parry Stern
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Nevada Attorney General
100 North Carson Street
Carson City, NV 89701

hstern@ag.nv.gov
702-486-3594
Party name: Charles Daniels, Director, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jonathan Michael Kirshbaum
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of the Federal Public Defender
411 E.Bonneville Avenue, Suite 250
Las Vegas, NV 89101

jonathan_kirshbaum@fd.org
702-388-6577
Party name: Ronald Ross