No. 20-853 | |
Title: | Andrei Iancu, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office, Petitioner v. Fall Line Patents, LLC, et al. |
Docketed: | December 28, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2019-1956) |
Decision Date: | July 28, 2020 Rule 12.4 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 29, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 23 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 27, 2021) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 27 2021 | Brief of respondent Apple Inc. in support filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 10 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021. |
Feb 22 2021 | Response Requested. (Due March 24, 2021) |
Mar 05 2021 | Brief of respondent Fall Line Patents, LLC in support filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 19 2021 | Brief of respondent HemoSonics LLC filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 22 2021 | Brief of respondent James Gelsin Marx in support submitted. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 07 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/23/2021. |
Jun 21 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021. |
Jun 28 2021 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of United States v. Arthrex, Inc., 594 U. S. ___ (2021). Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
Jul 30 2021 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Acting Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Andrei Iancu, Under Secretary of Commerce For Intellectual Property and Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Matthew James Antonelli Counsel of Record | Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP 4306 Yoakum Blvd., Ste. 450 Houston, TX 77006 matt@ahtlawfirm.com | 713-581-3000 |
Party name: Fall Line Patents, LLC | ||
Edward Maughan Cannon Counsel of Record | Knobbe, Martens, Olson & Bear LLP 2040 Main Street, 14th Floor Irvine, CA 92614 ted.cannon@knobbe.com | 949-760-0404 |
Party name: James Gelsin Marx | ||
Nicole A. Saharsky Counsel of Record | Mayer Brown LLP 1999 K Street NW Washington, DC 20006 nsaharsky@mayerbrown.com | 202-263-3052 |
Party name: HemoSonics LLC | ||
Thomas Gregory Sprankling Counsel of Record | Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP 2600 El Camino Real, Suite 400 Palo Alto, CA 94306 Thomas.Sprankling@wilmerhale.com | 650-858-6000 |
Party name: Apple Inc. |