No. 20-843
Title:New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Keith M. Corlett, in His Official Capacity as Superintendent of New York State Police, et al.
Docketed:December 23, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-156)
   Decision Date:August 26, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 17 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 22, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Jan 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 22, 2021 to February 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 11 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 22, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: Keith M. Corlett, et al.