No. 20-836
Title:Marcus Broadway, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 22, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2979)
   Decision Date:August 5, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 16 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 21, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 21, 2021 to February 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 22, 2021.
Jan 21 2021Brief amicus curiae of Due Process Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 22, 2021 to March 24, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 24, 2021.
Mar 24 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 07 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/23/2021.
Apr 07 2021Reply of petitioner Marcus Broadway filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jared Alan McClain
    Counsel of Record
The New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

jared.mcclain@ncla.onmicrosoft.com
8563050034
Party name: Marcus Broadway
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Theodore Augustus Howard
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
1776 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006-0000

thoward@wiley.law
(202) 719-7120
Party name: Due Process Institute