No. 20-8312
Title:Ronald Delester Burke, Petitioner
v.
Washington
Docketed:June 15, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Washington
   Case Numbers:(96783-1)
   Decision Date:January 14, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 09 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 15, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixAppendixProof of Service
Jul 14 2021Waiver of right of respondent Washington to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Bruns Middaugh
    Counsel of Record
Middaugh Law. PLLC
600 University Street, Suite 3020
Seattle, WA 98101

Mark@middaughlaw.com
2069194269
Party name: Ronald Burke
Attorneys for Respondent
Theodore Michael Cropley
    Counsel of Record
Pierce County Prosecuting Attorney
930 Tacoma Avenue South
Room 946
Tacoma, WA 98402

theodore.cropley@piercecountywa.gov
2537986708
Party name: Washington