No. 20-831
Title:Washington, Petitioner
v.
Endy Domingo-Cornelio
Docketed:December 21, 2020
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Washington
   Case Numbers:(97205-2)
   Decision Date:September 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 16 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 20, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 20, 2021 to February 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 31 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 19, 2021.
Jan 20 2021Brief amici curiae of States of Indiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 20 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Criminal Justice Legal Foundation.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 18 2021Brief of respondent Endy Domingo-Cornelio in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 18 2021Motion of Endy Domingo-Cornelio for leave to proceed in forma pauperis not accepted for filing. (March 10, 2021)
Mar 08 2021Reply of petitioner State of Washington filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 16 2021Supplemental Brief of Endy Domingo-Cornelio submitted.
Main DocumentOther
Mar 18 2021Supplemental brief of petitioner State of Washington filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 29 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Criminal Justice Legal Foundation GRANTED.
Mar 29 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Anne Elizabeth Egeler
    Counsel of Record
930 Tacoma Avenue
Rm. 946
Tacoma, WA 98402

anne.egeler@piercecountywa.gov
(253) 732-2083
Party name: State of Washington
Attorneys for Respondent
Emily M. Gause
    Counsel of Record
Gause Law Offices, PLLC
130 Andover Park East, Suite 300
Tukwila, WA 98188

emily@emilygauselaw.com
206-660-8775
Party name: Endy Domingo-Cornelio
Other
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: States of Indiana, Alaska, Arizona, Idaho, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Montana, Nebraska, Ohio, South Carolina, South Dakota, Texas, and Utah
Kymberlee Claire Stapleton
    Counsel of Record
Criminal Justice Legal Foundation
2131 L Street
Sacramento, CA 95816

kym.stapleton@cjlf.org
916-446-0345
Party name: Criminal Justice Legal Foundation