No. 20-830
Title:Washington, Petitioner
v.
Said Omer Ali
Docketed:December 21, 2020
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Washington
   Case Numbers:(95578-6)
   Decision Date:September 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 16 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 20, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 20, 2021 to February 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 19, 2021.
Jan 20 2021Brief amici curiae of States of Indiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 20 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Criminal Justice Legal Foundation.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 18 2021Brief of respondent Said Omer Ali in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 18 2021Motion of Said Omer Ali for leave to proceed in forma pauperis not accepted for filing. (March 10, 2021)
Mar 08 2021Reply of petitioner The State of Washington filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 16 2021Letter of Supplemental Authority of Said Omer Ali submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 19 2021Supplemental brief of petitioner The State of Washington filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 29 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Criminal Justice Legal Foundation GRANTED.
Mar 29 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amy R. Meckling
    Counsel of Record
King County Prosecuting Attorney's Office
516 Third Ave. W554
Seattle, WA 98104

amy.meckling@kingcounty.gov
206-477-9497
Party name: The State of Washington
Attorneys for Respondent
Corey Evan Parker
    Counsel of Record
The Appellate Law Firm
300 Lenora St., Ste. 900
Seattle, WA 98121

corey@mltalaw.com
(877) 412-4786
Party name: Said Omer Ali
Other
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: States of Indiana, Alaska, Arizona, Idaho, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Montana, Nebraska, Ohio, South Carolina, South Dakota, Texas, and Utah
Kymberlee Claire Stapleton
    Counsel of Record
Criminal Justice Legal Foundation
2131 L Street
Sacramento, CA 95816

kym.stapleton@cjlf.org
916-446-0345
Party name: Criminal Justice Legal Foundation