No. 20-83
Title:Jacob Jones, et al., Petitioners
v.
Wayne Duke Kalbaugh
Docketed:July 29, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-6205)
   Decision Date:March 30, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:April 23, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 22 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 28, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Aug 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 28, 2020 to October 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 28 2020Response of Jacob Jones, et al. to motion not accepted for filing. (September 08, 2020)
Sep 08 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 27, 2020.
Nov 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Ambre Camille Gooch
    Counsel of Record
Collins, Zorn & Wagner, P.C.
429 N.E. 50th Street, 2nd Floor
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

acg@czwlaw.com
405-524-2070
Party name: Jacob Jones, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Wayne Duke Kalbaugh450429
N.F.C.C./G-C-112
1605 East Main Street
Sayre, OK 73662

Party name: Wayne D. Kalbaugh