No. 20-827
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Zayn al-Abidin Muhammad Husayn, aka Abu Zubaydah, et al.
Docketed:December 18, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-35218)
   Decision Date:September 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:July 20, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 17 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 19, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jan 06 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 19, 2021 to February 11, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 11, 2021.
Feb 11 2021Brief of respondents Zayn al-Abidin Muhammad Husayn, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 03 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 04 2021Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021.
Apr 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Apr 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/23/2021.
Apr 26 2021Petition GRANTED.
May 07 2021Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
May 10 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner United States.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
May 11 2021Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 2, 2021. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 13, 2021.
May 24 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Jul 02 2021Brief of petitioner United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jul 13 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Wednesday, October 6, 2021.
Jul 28 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Jul 29 2021The record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Aug 03 2021CIRCULATED
Aug 13 2021Brief of respondents Zayn al-Abidin Muhammad Husayn, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2021Brief amici curiae of Council on American-Islamic Relations filed. (Distributed corrected brief on 8/31/21).
Aug 17 2021Brief amicus curiae of Council on American-Islamic Relations filed with correction. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2021Brief amici curiae of Evidence Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of Current and Former U.N. Special Rapporteurs filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2021Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union and Counsel for Ammar al Baluchi filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Human Rights Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Center for Justice and Accountability filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Former Federal Judges filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of September 11th Families for Peaceful Tomorrows filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Torture Survivors Maher Arar, et al., filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Rights filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2021Brief amici curiae of National Religious Campaign Against Torture, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Physicians for Human Rights, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2021Brief amici curiae of The Bureau of Investigative Journalism and The Rendition Project filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Floyd Abrams Institute for Freedom of Expression, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Bilal Abdul Kareem filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Coalition of Human Rights Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 03 2021Letter Regarding Amicus Brief on Behalf of Former Federal Judges of Former Federal Judges submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 13 2021Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 06 2021Argued. For petitioner: Brian H. Fletcher, Acting Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: David F. Klein, Washington, D. C.
Oct 15 2021Letter of petitioner United States, per oral argument, filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Oct 25 2021Letter of Zayn al-Abidin Muhammad Husayn, et al. submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondents
David Franklin Klein
    Counsel of Record
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
1200 17th Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

david.klein@pillsburylaw.com
202-663-8000
Party name: Zayn al-Abidin Muhammad Husayn, et al.
Christopher W. TompkinsBetts, Patterson & Mines, P.S.
701 Pike Street, Suite 1400
Seattle, WA 98101

206-292-9988
Party name: James Elmer Mitchell and John Jessen
Other
Baher Azmy
    Counsel of Record
Seton Hall University School of LawCenter for So
833 McCarter Highway
Newark, NJ 07102

baherazmy@gmail.com
6097120345
Party name: Center for Constitutional Rights
David John Butler
    Counsel of Record
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
65 East State Street
Suite 1000
Columbus, OH 43215

dbutler@taftlaw.com
614-334-6167
Party name: National Religious Campaign Against Torture, et al.
Carmen Ka Man Cheung
    Counsel of Record
Center for Justice and Accountability
One Hallidie Plaza #750
San Francisco, CA 94102

ccheung@cja.org
4156506158
Party name: Center for Justice and Accountability
Timothy J. Droske
    Counsel of Record
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
50 South Sixth Street
Suite 1500
Minneapolis, MN 55402

droske.tim@dorsey.com
612-340-2600
Party name: Human Rights Organizations
Timothy K. Ford
    Counsel of Record
MacDonald Hoague & Bayless
705 Second Avenue
Suite 1500
Seattle, WA 98104

cathyh@mhb.com
2066221604
Party name: Evidence Law Professors
Hannah Ruth Garry
    Counsel of Record
University of Southern California Gould School of Law Int. Human Rights Clinic
699 Exposition Blvd., #442
Los Angeles, CA 90089

hgarry@law.usc.edu
(303) 819-4062
Party name: Torture Survivors Maher Arar, et al.,
Daniel M. Greenfield
    Counsel of Record
MacArthur Justice Center
Northwestern Pritzker School of Law
375 E. Chicago Ave.
Chicago, IL 60611-3069

daniel-greenfield@law.northwestern.edu
(312) 503-8538
Party name: The Bureau of Investigative Journalism and The Rendition Project
Eric Leslie Lewis
    Counsel of Record
Lewis Baach Kaufmann Middlemiss PLLC
1101 New York Avenue, NW, Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

eric.lewis@lbkmlaw.com
2028338900
Party name: Bilal Abdul Kareem
Wendy Liu
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC 20009

wliu@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen
Lawrence S. Lustberg
    Counsel of Record
Gibbons P.C.
One Gateway Center
Newark, NJ 07102

llustberg@gibbonslaw.com
973-596-4500
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union and Counsel for Ammar al Baluchi
Lena Fatina Masri
    Counsel of Record
CAIR Legal Defense Fund
453 New Jersey Avenue SE
Washington, DC 20003

ldf@cair.com
2027426420
Party name: Council on American-Islamic Relations
Hope R. Metcalf
    Counsel of Record
Lowenstein International Human Rights Clinic
127 Wall Street
P.O. Box 209090
New Haven, CT 06520-9090

hope.metcalf@yale.edu
203-432-9404
Party name: Current and Former U.N. Special Rapporteurs
Matthew Robert Nicely
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
2001 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mnicely@akingump.com
2028874046
Party name: Coalition of Human Rights Scholars
David A. Schulz
    Counsel of Record
Media Freedom and Information Access Clinic Yale Law School
127 Wall Street
New Haven, CT 06511

david.schulz@yale.edu
(203) 432-4992
Party name: Floyd Abrams Institute for Freedom of Expression, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, and National Security Archive
Gerson H. Smoger
    Counsel of Record
Suite 550
14800 Quorum Drive
Dallas, TX 75240

gerson@texasinjurylaw.com
9722435297
Party name: Physicians for Human Rights, et al.,
Steven S. Sparling
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

ssparling@kramerlevin.com
2127159100
Party name: September 11th Families for Peaceful Tomorrows
Meaghan Elizabeth McLaine VerGow
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mvergow@omm.com
(202)-383-5300
Party name: Former Federal Judges
Richard Roy Wiebe
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Richard R. Wiebe
44 Montgomery Street
Suite 650
San Francisco, CA 94104

wiebe@pacbell.net
4155058793
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation