No. 20-825
Title:Christopher Brewer, Petitioner
v.
Teresa Hooks, et al.
Docketed:December 18, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-10628)
   Decision Date:June 19, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:September 1, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 01 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 19, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Timothy J. Buckley III
    Counsel of Record
Buckley Christopher P.C.
2970 Clairmont Road NE
Suite 650
Atlanta, GA 30329

TBUCKLEY@BCHLAWPC.COM
(404) 974-4570
Party name: Christopher Brewer