No. 20-82
Vide 20-96
Title:Kane County, Utah, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:July 29, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-4122)
   Decision Date:June 25, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:February 27, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 23 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 28, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2020Motion of respondents Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, et al. to extend the time to file a response from August 28, 2020 to October 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 27, 2020, for all respondents.
Oct 27 2020Brief of respondents Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 09 2020Reply of petitioner Kane County, Utah filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 09 2020Reply of Kane County, Utah not accepted for filing.(Dupilicate Submission) (November 25, 2020)
Nov 10 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Melissa Ann Holyoak
    Counsel of Record
Utah Attorney General's Office
160 E. 300 S.
5th Floor
Salt Lake City, UT 84114

melissaholyoak@agutah.gov
5738235377
Party name: State of Utah
Shawn Terry Welch
    Counsel of Record
Holland & Hart, LLP
222 South Main Street, Suite 2200
Salt Lake City, UT 84101

stwelch@hollandhart.com
8017995800
Party name: Kane County, Utah
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, et al.
Stephen H. M. BlochSouthern Utah Wilderness All.
425 East 100 South
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

steve@suwa.org
8014863161
Party name: Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, et al.