No. 20-819 | |
Title: | Duy T. Mai, Petitioner v. United States, et al. |
Docketed: | December 17, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-36071) |
Decision Date: | March 11, 2020 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 10, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 09 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 19, 2021) |
PetitionAppendixProof of Service | |
Dec 22 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 19, 2021 to February 18, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Dec 23 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 18, 2021. |
Jan 19 2021 | Brief amici curiae of Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 28 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 18, 2021 to March 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jan 28 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 19, 2021. |
Mar 19 2021 | Brief of respondents United States, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 07 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/23/2021. |
Apr 26 2021 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Vitaliy A Kertchen Counsel of Record | Kertchen Law, PLLC 917 S 10th St Tacoma, WA 98405 vitaliy@kertchenlaw.com | 253-905-8415 |
Party name: Duy T. Mai | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Acting Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Robert Jeffrey Olson Counsel of Record | William J. Olson P.C. 370 Maple Avenue West Suite 4 Vienna, VA 22180-5615 rob@wjopc.com | 703-356-5070 |
Party name: Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of California, Inc., and Heller Foundation |