No. 20-808 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Johnny Duane Miles, Petitioner
v.
California
Docketed:December 15, 2020
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of California
   Case Numbers:(S086234)
   Decision Date:May 28, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:July 15, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 14, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 14, 2021 to February 16, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 16, 2021.
Jan 14 2021Amicus brief of Former State and Federal Court Judges submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Clifford Gardner
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Cliff Gardner
1448 San Pablo Avenue
Berkeley, CA 94702

casetris@aol.com
(510) 524-1093
Party name: Johnny Duane Miles
Attorneys for Respondent
Seth Matthew Friedman
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice, Office of the Attorney General
600 West Broadway
Suite 1800
San Diego, CA 92101

seth.friedman@doj.ca.gov
6197389157
Party name: California
Other
Debo P. Adegbile
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Hale Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
250 Greenwich Street
New York, NY 10007

Debo.Adegbile@wilmerhale.com
212-295-6717
Party name: Former State and Federal Court Judges